GA SB98 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-10 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 32 of the O.C.G.A., relating to highways, bridges, and ferries, so as to provide for eligible expenditures for the Georgia Freight Railroad Program of the Georgia Department of Transportation; to provide for procedures, conditions, and limitations for public and private financing of projects; to revise definitions; to amend Code Section 52-2-5 of the O.C.G.A., relating to composition of the Georgia Ports Authority; appointment, terms, and qualifications of members generally; filling of vacancies; election of chairperson, vice chairperson, and secretary-treasurer; and quorum, so as to add the commissioner of transportation as an ex officio member of the Georgia Ports Authority; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Georgia Freight Railroad Program; eligible expenditures; procedures, conditions, and limitations for public and private financing of projects; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-08 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #160 (Y: 53 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-10HouseHouse Second Readers
2021-03-09HouseHouse First Readers
2021-03-08SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2021-03-08SenateSenate Third Read
2021-03-05SenateSenate Read Second Time
2021-03-03SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-02-08SenateSenate Read and Referred
2021-02-04SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback