GA SB97 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-10 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 20-3-66 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to determination of in-state resident status of students for tuition or fees, so as to codify the university system policy of out-of-state tuition differential waivers; to require that a certain percentage of such waivers be allowed for certain institutions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In-State Resident Status of Students; university system policy of out-of-state tuition differential waivers; codify

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-08 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #191 (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-10HouseHouse Second Readers
2021-03-09HouseHouse First Readers
2021-03-08SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2021-03-08SenateSenate Third Read
2021-03-08SenateSenate Taken from Table
2021-03-08SenateSenate Tabled
2021-02-25SenateSenate Read Second Time
2021-02-24SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-02-08SenateSenate Read and Referred
2021-02-04SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback