GA SB96 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-18 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-18 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 17 of Title 45 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to notaries public, so as to provide that the identification of persons for whom notaries perform notarial acts shall be evidenced satisfactorily by a valid Veterans Health Identification Card issued by the United States Department of Veterans Affairs; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Notaries Public; identification of persons for whom notaries perform notarial acts shall be evidenced; valid Veterans Health Identification Card issued by the United States Department of Veterans Affairs; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Lester Jackson [D] | Sen. Ed Harbison [D] | Sen. Emanuel Jones [D] | Sen. Sheikh Rahman [D] |
Sen. Derek Mallow [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-01 - House - Passage: House Vote #836 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #624 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #624 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-18 | Effective Date 2022-07-01 | |
2022-04-18 | Act 643 | |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2022-04-01 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-04-01 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-03-29 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-17 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-03-16 | House | House First Readers |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Senate Hopper |