GA SB89 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 2 of Title 32 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to officers in the Department of Transportation, so as to provide for state investment in railways and railroad facilities and equipment; to provide that the commissioner of transportation may administer a Georgia Freight Railroad Program; to provide for subprograms within such program; to provide for annual reporting; to provide for a short title; to provide for legislative findings; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation Department Officers; railways and railroad facilities and equipment; provide for state investment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - House - House Vote #862 (Y: 149 N: 13 NV: 15 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Vote #57 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-29HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-03-29HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-03-19HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-02-17HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-02-16HouseHouse First Readers
2017-02-15SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-02-15SenateSenate Third Read
2017-02-08SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-02-07SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-01-30SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-01-26SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback