GA SB89 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-29 - House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-29 - House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 2 of Title 32 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to officers in the Department of Transportation, so as to provide for state investment in railways and railroad facilities and equipment; to provide that the commissioner of transportation may administer a Georgia Freight Railroad Program; to provide for subprograms within such program; to provide for annual reporting; to provide for a short title; to provide for legislative findings; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Transportation Department Officers; railways and railroad facilities and equipment; provide for state investment
Sponsors
Sen. David Shafer [R] | Sen. Steve Gooch [R] | Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] |
Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. Ellis Black [R] | Rep. Kasey Carpenter [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - House - House Vote #862 (Y: 149 N: 13 NV: 15 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Vote #57 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Vote #57 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-03-29 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-03-19 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-02-17 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-16 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Senate Hopper |