GA SB82 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Act 558
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Act 558
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 7 of Article 7 of Chapter 3 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to HOPE scholarships and grants, so as to create a need based HOPE scholarship and grant; to provide for definitions; to provide for eligibility; to provide for rules and regulations; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
HOPE; need based HOPE scholarship and grant; create
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - House - House Vote #711 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #526 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #526 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Act 558 | |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2018-03-15 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-15 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-03-07 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-03-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-28 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Senate Hopper |