GA SB81 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-06 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 6 of Chapter 4 of Title 26 of the O.C.G.A., relating to pharmacies, so as to provide that the state health officer may issue a standing order permitting certain persons and entities to obtain opioid antagonists under the conditions the state health officer may impose; to amend Chapter 13 of Title 16 of the O.C.G.A., relating to controlled substances; to amend Code Section 31-12-2 of the O.C.G.A., relating to reporting disease, confidentiality, reporting required by pharmacists, immunity from liability as to information supplied, and notification of potential bioterrorism; to amend Chapter 5 of Title 26 of the O.C.G.A., relating to drug abuse treatment and education programs; provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Jeffrey Dallas Gay, Jr., Act."; opioid antagonists under conditions the state health officer may impose; provide state health officer may issue standing order permitting certain persons and entities to obtain

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Vote #123 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-06HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-03-03HouseHouse First Readers
2017-03-01SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-03-01SenateSenate Third Read
2017-02-14SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-02-10SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-01-30SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-01-26SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback