GA SB80 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Veto V10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 10 of Article 7 of Chapter 3 of Title 12 of the O.C.G.A., relating to the Georgia Music Hall of Fame Authority, so as to remove expired provisions related to the issuance and review of requests for proposals for a new location, ownership, management, or operation of the hall of fame; to amend Part 12 of Article 7 of Chapter 3 of Title 12 of the O.C.G.A., relating to the Georgia Sports Hall of Fame Authority, so as to remove expired provisions related to the issuance and review of requests for proposals for a new location, ownership, management, or operation of the hall of fame; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Georgia Music Hall of Fame Authority; expired provisions; issuance and review of requests for proposals for a new location, ownership; remove

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - House - House Vote #239 (Y: 158 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #157 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10 Veto V10
2019-05-10SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2019-04-05SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2019-03-14HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2019-03-14HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-03-13HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2019-03-11HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-03-08HouseHouse First Readers
2019-03-07SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2019-03-07SenateSenate Third Read
2019-02-22SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-02-21SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2019-02-11SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-02-08SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback