GA SB75 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on May 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on May 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 44-7-23 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to termination of residential lease after issuance of civil family violence order or criminal family violence order, notice, and occupancy, so as to provide for lease terminations for victims of stalking; to provide for a definition; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Termination of Residential Lease; victims of stalking; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - House - Passage: House Vote #301 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #152 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Motion To Table All Bills On The Rules Calendar: Senate Vote #127 (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #152 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Motion To Table All Bills On The Rules Calendar: Senate Vote #127 (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | Effective Date 2021-07-01 | |
2021-05-06 | Act 236 | |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2021-03-25 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-25 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-03-16 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-09 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-03-08 | House | House First Readers |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Senate Hopper |