GA SB71 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - House Third Reading Lost
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 4 of Chapter 7 of Title 31 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to county and municipal hospital authorities, so as to revise provisions relating to the sale or lease of a hospital by a hospital authority; to provide for the investment of funds by certain hospital authorities; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hospital Authority; sale or lease of a hospital; provisions; revise

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-25 - House - House Vote #760 (Y: 83 N: 79 NV: 3 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #71 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-25HouseHouse Third Reading Lost
2020-06-25HouseHouse Third Readers
2020-06-22HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2020-06-22HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2019-04-02HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2019-04-02HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2019-03-29HouseHouse Postponed
2019-03-28HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2019-03-01HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-02-28HouseHouse First Readers
2019-02-27SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-02-27SenateSenate Third Read
2019-02-22SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-02-21SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-02-08SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-02-07SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback