GA SB7 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 9 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act revising, superseding, and consolidating the laws relating to the governing authority of DeKalb County and creating a chairman and board of commissioners of said county, approved March 8, 1956 (Ga. L. 1956, p. 3237), as amended, particularly by an Act approved April 9, 1981 (Ga. L. 1981, p. 4304), an Act approved March 20, 1990 (Ga. L. 1990, p. 3900), an Act approved April 13, 1992 (Ga. L. 1992, p. 6137), and an Act approved May 12, 2015 (Ga. L. 2015, p. 3811), so as to change a definition regarding the Board of Ethics of DeKalb County to exclude certain employees and persons; to provide for related matters; to provide for a referendum; to provide for contingent effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Board of Ethics of DeKalb County; change a definition

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #394 (Y: 53 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Vote #322 (Y: 157 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #15 (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13 Effective Date
2019-04-09SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2019-04-02SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2019-03-28HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-03-28HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-03-28HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-02-11HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-02-08HouseHouse First Readers
2019-02-07SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-02-07SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-01-30SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-01-28SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback