GA SB69 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 21 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to primaries and elections generally, so as to provide that persons desiring to register to vote or update their voter registration through an application for a driver's license or identification card shall be required to affirmatively indicate such desire on such application; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Primaries and Elections; persons desiring to register to vote or update their voter registration through and application for a driver's license; indicate such desire on such application; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-08 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Sb 213, Sb 241, Sr 100, Sb 62, Sb 69, Sb 71, Sb 72: Senate Vote #155 (Y: 34 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Senate Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59221 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/196520 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59221#18461 |