GA SB66 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Effective Date 2023-05-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Effective Date 2023-05-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 15-6-2 of the O.C.G.A., relating to the number of judges of superior courts, so as to provide for an additional judge of the superior courts of the Atlantic Judicial Circuit; to provide for related matters; to provide for effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Superior Courts; Atlantic Judicial Circuit; additional judge; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Billy Hickman [R] | Sen. Mike Hodges [R] | Sen. John Kennedy [R] | Sen. Steve Gooch [R] |
Sen. Blake Tillery [R] | Rep. William Werkheiser [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-27 - Senate - Agree To House Substitute: Senate Vote #310 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - Passage: House Vote #281 (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #173 (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - Passage: House Vote #281 (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #173 (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | Effective Date 2023-05-01 | |
2023-05-01 | Act 76 | |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2023-03-23 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2023-03-23 | House | House Third Readers |
2023-03-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-03-16 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2023-03-15 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-03-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-03-07 | House | House First Readers |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Senate Hopper |