GA SB66 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 36 of the O.C.G.A., relating to local government, so as to enact the "Streamlining Wireless Facilities and Antennas Act"; to streamline the deployment of wireless broadband in the public rights of way; to address any perceived conflicts between this Act and Chapter 66B of Title 36;to provide that nothing in this Act relieves any person of any duties provided for in Chapter 9 of Title 25; to provide for related matters; to provide for effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Streamlining Wireless Facilities and Antennas Act"

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-19SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-02-15SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-02-07SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-02-06SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback