GA SB637 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Effective Date 2022-04-25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Effective Date 2022-04-25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to create the City of Senoia Building and Facilities Authority; to provide for severability; to provide for a short title; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
City of Senoia Building and Facilities Authority; create
Sponsors
Sen. Matt Brass [R] | Rep. Josh Bonner [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #806 (Y: 159 N: 5 NV: 8 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #718 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #718 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Effective Date 2022-04-25 | |
2022-04-25 | Act 713 | |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2022-03-30 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-30 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-03-30 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-29 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-03-28 | House | House First Readers |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate Transmitted House |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Hopper |