GA SB629 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-28 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Intragovernmental Coordination Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-28 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Intragovernmental Coordination Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act incorporating the City of Milton in Fulton County, Georgia, approved March 29, 2006 (Ga. L. 2006, p. 3554), as amended, so as to modify the maximum income for a senior homestead exemption; to provide for definitions; to provide for compliance with constitutional requirements; to provide for a referendum, effective dates, and automatic repeal; to provide for applicability; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
City of Milton, the maximum income for a senior homestead exemption; modify
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #700 (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-03-25 | House | House First Readers |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Senate Hopper |