GA SB615 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Effective Date 2022-04-25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Effective Date 2022-04-25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing a new charter for the Town of Lyerly, approved April 11, 2012 (Ga. L. 2012, p. 4934), so as to provide for the annexation of certain territory into the boundaries of the city; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Town of Lyerly; annexation of certain territory into the boundaries of the city; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - House - Supplemental Local Calendar : House Vote #762 (Y: 152 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #685 (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #685 (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Effective Date 2022-04-25 | |
2022-04-25 | Act 706 | |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2022-03-23 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-23 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-03-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-21 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-03-18 | House | House First Readers |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Senate Hopper |