GA SB603 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-01 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-01 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 11 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to public school property and facilities, so as to provide for an outdoor learning spaces pilot program; to provide for a pilot program evaluation and report; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Public School Property and Facilities; an outdoor learning spaces pilot program; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-15 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #663 (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-01 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-03-17 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-03-16 | House | House First Readers |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate Hopper |