GA SB60 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-5)
Status: Passed on April 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-26 - Effective Date 2023-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-5)
Status: Passed on April 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-26 - Effective Date 2023-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 14 of Chapter 1 of Title 10 of the O.C.G.A., relating to secondary metals recyclers, so as to provide that it shall be illegal for certain persons to purchase, possess, obtain, or sell or attempt to purchase, possess, obtain, or sell used, detached catalytic converters, used utility wire, or used communications copper; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Secondary Metals Recyclers; it shall be illegal for certain persons to purchase, possess, obtain, or sell or attempt to purchase, possess, obtain, or sell; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-29 - Senate - Agree To House Substitute: Senate Vote #357 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - Passage: House Vote #286 (Y: 162 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #37 (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - Passage: House Vote #286 (Y: 162 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #37 (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-26 | Effective Date 2023-07-01 | |
2023-04-26 | Act 31 | |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2023-03-23 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2023-03-23 | House | House Third Readers |
2023-03-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-02-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-02-14 | House | House First Readers |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Senate Hopper |