GA SB6 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 5 of Title 28 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to fiscal bills generally, so as to provide for independent economic analyses to be procured by the Office of Planning and Budget for certain tax benefits upon request by the chairpersons of the House Committee on Ways and Means and the Senate Finance Committee; to provide a short title; to provide for limits; to provide for summaries to be attached to related fiscal notes; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Tax Credit Return on Investment Act of 2021"; enact

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-31 - House - Adopt Ccr: House Vote #421 (Y: 146 N: 25 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Adopt Conference Committee Report: Senate Vote #429 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - Passage: House Vote #302 (Y: 152 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #15 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Senate Vote #14 (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-04 Effective Date 2021-07-01
2021-05-04 Act 166
2021-05-04SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2021-04-07SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2021-03-31HouseHouse Conference Committee Report Adopted
2021-03-31SenateSenate Conference Committee Report Adopted
2021-03-29HouseHouse Conference Committee Appointed 146th, 115th, 159th
2021-03-29SenateSenate Conference Committee Appointed 56th, 52nd, 1st
2021-03-29HouseHouse Insisted
2021-03-25SenateSenate Disagreed House Amend or Sub
2021-03-25HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2021-03-25HouseHouse Third Readers
2021-03-25HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-03-25HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2021-03-23HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-02-03HouseHouse Second Readers
2021-02-02HouseHouse First Readers
2021-02-01SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2021-02-01SenateSenate Third Read
2021-02-01SenateSenate Engrossed
2021-01-29SenateSenate Read Second Time
2021-01-28SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2021-01-14SenateSenate Read and Referred
2021-01-13SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback