GA SB6 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 12 of Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to commissions and other agencies, so as to create the Georgia Regional Transit Council; to provide for legislative intent; to provide for definitions; to provide for the membership, powers, and duties of the council; to provide for a report and proposal by the council; to provide for assignment of the council to the Department of Transportation for administrative purposes; to provide for compensation and expenses; to provide for contingent automatic repeal; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Georgia Regional Transit Council; definitions; membership; powers; duties; create

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #79 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-30HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2017-03-16HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-02-24HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-02-23HouseHouse First Readers
2017-02-22SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-02-22SenateSenate Third Read
2017-02-08SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-02-07SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-01-25SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-01-24SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback