GA SB566 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 33 of the O.C.G.A., relating to insurance, so as to clarify that, under the Surprise Billing Consumer Protection Act, a medical or traumatic condition, sickness, or injury includes a mental health condition or substance use disorder and that emergency medical services include post-stabilization services; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Surprise Billing Consumer Protection Act; a medical or traumatic condition includes a mental health condition or substance use disorder; emergency medical services include post-stabilization services; clarify
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Burke [R] | Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] | Sen. Ben Watson [R] | Sen. Kay Kirkpatrick [R] |
Sen. Michael Dugan [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] | Sen. Bo Hatchett [R] | Rep. Darlene Taylor [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Senate - Agree To House Substitute: Senate Vote #758 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - House - Passage: House Vote #785 (Y: 163 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #628 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - House - Passage: House Vote #785 (Y: 163 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #628 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | Effective Date 2022-07-01 | |
2022-05-12 | Act 867 | |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2022-03-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-03-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-03-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-03-17 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-03-16 | House | House First Readers |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senate Hopper |