GA SB565 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - Effective Date 2022-05-09
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - Effective Date 2022-05-09
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 10 of Title 17 of the O.C.G.A., relating to procedure for sentencing and imposition of punishment, so as to provide that at any time after conviction for a misdemeanor or felony offense a defendant convicted of an offense and sentenced as a direct result of being a victim of trafficking for labor or sexual servitude may petition the sentencing court to grant the relief of vacatur; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Sentence and Punishment; any time after conviction; defendant convicted of an offense and sentenced as a direct result of being a victim of trafficking for labor or sexual servitude may petition the sentencing court to grant the relief of vacatur; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Strickland [R] | Sen. Kay Kirkpatrick [R] | Sen. Harold Jones [D] | Sen. John Albers [R] |
Sen. Michael Rhett [D] | Rep. James Burchett [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Senate - Agree To House Substitute: Senate Vote #759 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - House - Passage: House Vote #788 (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #644 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - House - Passage: House Vote #788 (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #644 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Effective Date 2022-05-09 | |
2022-05-09 | Act 834 | |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2022-03-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-03-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-03-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-03-17 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-03-16 | House | House First Readers |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Hopper |