GA SB55 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 2 of Title 47 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to employee and employer contributions and creation of funds for contributions, benefits, and administrative expenses, so as to revise the method and manner by which a member of the Employees' Retirement System of Georgia may purchase an annuity; to authorize the board of trustees to offer a supplemental guaranteed lifetime annuity to certain retired members purchased by transfer of funds from the state sponsored deferred compensation plans; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Retirement; method and manner by which a member of the Employees' Retirement System of Georgia may purchase an annuity; revise
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-21 - House - House Vote #259 (Y: 171 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #38 (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #38 (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-07 | Act 256 | |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2019-03-21 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-21 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-13 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-22 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-21 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Senate Hopper |