GA SB546 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-01 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Intragovernmental Coordination Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-01 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Intragovernmental Coordination Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act relating to the board of education and school superintendent of the Carroll County School District, approved March 20, 1985 (Ga. L. 1985, p. 3945), as amended, particularly by an Act approved February 27, 2012 (Ga. L. 2012, p. 3780), so as to change the description of the education districts; to provide for definitions and inclusions; to provide for continuation in office; to provide for related matters; to provide for effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Carroll County School District; description of the education districts; change
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #561 (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-28 | House | House First Readers |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senate Transmitted House |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Hopper |