GA SB539 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 1 of Article 3 of Chapter 11 of Title 16 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to wiretapping, eavesdropping, surveillance, and related offenses, so as to provide that the use of any device to photograph or record patients in a health care facility shall be unlawful; to provide for exceptions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Wiretapping, Eavesdropping, Surveillance; use of any device to photograph or record patients in a health care facility shall be unlawful; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-01 - House - Passage: House Vote #830 (Y: 154 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #645 (Y: 48 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #645 (Y: 48 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Effective Date 2022-07-01 | |
2022-05-09 | Act 846 | |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2022-04-01 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-04-01 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-03-30 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-17 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-03-16 | House | House First Readers |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Hopper |