GA SB530 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-20 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate State and Local Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-20 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate State and Local Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the State Court of DeKalb County, formerly known as the Civil and Criminal Court of DeKalb County, approved February 14, 1951 (Ga. L. 1951, p. 2401), as amended, particularly by an Act approved March 13, 1957 (Ga. L. 1957, p. 3322), an Act approved February 18, 1960 (Ga. L. 1960, p. 2166), an Act approved March 3, 2015 (Ga. L. 2015, p. 3501), and an Act approved April 28, 2016 (Ga. L. 2016, p. 3950); to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State Court of DeKalb County; definitions; court shall be governed by general law related to state courts; provide
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-20 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Senate Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/58604 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/194210 |