GA SB52 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-12 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-12 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, so as to revise, modernize, correct errors or omissions in, and reenact the statutory portion of said Code, as amended, in furtherance of the work of the Code Revision Commission; to repeal portions of said Code, or Acts in amendment thereof, which have become obsolete, have been declared to be unconstitutional, or have been preempted or superseded by subsequent laws; to codify principles of law derived from decisions of the state Supreme Court; to provide for other matters relating to revision, reenactment, and publication of said Code; to provide for effect in event of conflicts; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Code Revision Commission; statutory portion of said Code; revise, modernize, correct errors or omissions in and reenact
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-04 - House - House Vote #118 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 22 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #28 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #28 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-12 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-12 | Act 321 | |
2019-05-12 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2019-03-04 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-04 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-02-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-19 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-15 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Senate Hopper |