GA SB52 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act relating to mental health and authorizing a licensed professional counselor to perform certain acts, Act No. 546, approved April 21, 2014 (Ga L. 2014, p. 347), as amended, particularly by an Act approved March 10, 2015 (Ga. L. 2015, p. 4), so as to repeal a sunset provision; to provide for an effective date; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mental Health; authorizing licensed professional counselor; sunset provision; repeal

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-22 - House - House Vote #292 (Y: 140 N: 23 NV: 10 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate Vote #34 (Y: 51 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-09 Effective Date
2017-05-09 Act 231
2017-05-09SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2017-04-03SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2017-03-22HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2017-03-22HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-03-15HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2017-02-14HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-02-10HouseHouse First Readers
2017-02-09SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2017-02-09SenateSenate Third Read
2017-02-08SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-02-07SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2017-01-25SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-01-24SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback