GA SB52 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act relating to mental health and authorizing a licensed professional counselor to perform certain acts, Act No. 546, approved April 21, 2014 (Ga L. 2014, p. 347), as amended, particularly by an Act approved March 10, 2015 (Ga. L. 2015, p. 4), so as to repeal a sunset provision; to provide for an effective date; and for other purposes.
Title
Mental Health; authorizing licensed professional counselor; sunset provision; repeal
Sponsors
Sen. P.K. Martin [R] | Sen. Renee Unterman [R] | Sen. Dean Burke [R] | Sen. Ben Watson [R] |
Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. John Kennedy [R] | Rep. Katie Dempsey [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-22 - House - House Vote #292 (Y: 140 N: 23 NV: 10 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate Vote #34 (Y: 51 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate Vote #34 (Y: 51 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | Effective Date | |
2017-05-09 | Act 231 | |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2017-03-22 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-22 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-03-15 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-14 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-10 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Senate Hopper |