GA SB505 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Sections 35-8-23, 38-3-181, and 46-5-138.2 of the O.C.G.A., relating to basic training course for communications officers, definitions relative to emergency communications authority, and "director" defined and training and instruction, respectively, so as to require that 9-1-1 communications officers receive training in the delivery of high-quality telephone cardiopulmonary resuscitation; to provide training requirements; to provide for compliance reviews; to provide for the establishment of continuing education units for communications officers; to provide for a definition; to require certain training for directors of public safety answering points; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Communications Officers; 9-1-1 communications officers receive training in the delivery of high-quality telephone cardiopulmonary resuscitation; require
Sponsors
Sen. Randy Robertson [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] |
Sen. Kay Kirkpatrick [R] | Rep. Houston Gaines [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - Senate - Agree To House Substitute: Senate Vote #867 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - Passage: House Vote #860 (Y: 164 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #552 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - Passage: House Vote #860 (Y: 164 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #552 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | Effective Date 2022-07-01 | |
2022-05-02 | Act 800 | |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2022-04-04 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-04-04 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-04-01 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-03-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-28 | House | House First Readers |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Senate Hopper |