GA SB502 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-28 - Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub As Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 1 of Article 3 of Chapter 5 of Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general authority, duties, and procedure of the Department of Administrative Services, so as to prohibit state agencies from contracting for advertising or marketing services with certain companies or from supporting certain companies; to provide for definitions; to provide for certifications; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Administrative Services; state agencies from contracting for advertising or marketing services with certain companies or from supporting certain companies; prohibit

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-03-28 - Senate - Agree To House Substitute As Amended: Senate Vote #834 (Y: 34 N: 12 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - Passage: House Vote #809 (Y: 103 N: 64 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #594 (Y: 34 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-28SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub As Amended
2024-03-26HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2024-03-26HouseHouse Third Readers
2024-03-26HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2024-03-21HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2024-03-20HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2024-03-18HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2024-03-05HouseHouse Second Readers
2024-03-04HouseHouse First Readers
2024-02-29SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2024-02-29SenateSenate Third Read
2024-02-27SenateSenate Read Second Time
2024-02-26SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2024-02-15SenateSenate Read and Referred
2024-02-13SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/67043
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20232024/224025
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20232024/225440
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20232024/226141
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20232024/227649
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20232024/228389
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20232024/229020
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20232024/226011
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20232024/226089
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20232024/229198
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/67043#23173
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/67043#24472
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/67043#24627

Bill Comments

feedback