GA SB5 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-22 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 43 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to professions and businesses, so as to provide patient protection measures for patients undergoing sedation in certain settings; to provide for patients under conscious sedation in dental settings and for dental procedures in medispas; to provide for patients under varying levels of sedation in physician offices and medispas; to provide for definitions; to provide for rules and regulations; to provide for enforcement; to provide for statutory construction; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Professions and Businesses; patient protection measures for patients undergoing sedation in certain settings; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-08 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #25 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Adoption Of Amendment #1 By The Senator From The 6th: Senate Vote #24 (Y: 18 N: 26 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-22HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2021-02-17HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-02-10HouseHouse Second Readers
2021-02-09HouseHouse First Readers
2021-02-08SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2021-02-08SenateSenate Third Read
2021-02-04SenateSenate Read Second Time
2021-02-03SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2021-01-13SenateSenate Read and Referred
2021-01-12SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback