GA SB484 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-15 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-15 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 31 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to health, so as to adopt the Solemn Covenant of the States to Award Prizes for Curing Diseases; to provide for the entry of the state into a multistate compact to incentivize the development of cures for diseases through substantial financial awards; to provide for a commission to administer the compact; to establish the powers and duties of the commission; to provide for committees; to provide for financing; to provide for effectiveness; to provide for withdrawal, default, and expulsion; to provide for severability and construction; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Health; Solemn Covenant of the States to Award Prizes for Curing Diseases; adopt
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #600 (Y: 49 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #631 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #631 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-03-13 | House | House First Readers |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate Hopper |