GA SB48 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 20 of the O.C.G.A., relating to education, so as to provide for identification of and support for students in pre-kindergarten through second grade with dyslexia; to provide for definitions; to require the Department of Education to make a dyslexia informational handbook available to local school systems; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Dyslexia; identification of and support for students in pre-kindergarten through second grade; provide
Sponsors
Sen. P.K. Martin [R] | Sen. Kay Kirkpatrick [R] | Sen. Matt Brass [R] | Sen. Renee Unterman [R] |
Sen. Freddie Sims [D] | Sen. Zahra Karinshak [D] | Rep. Brett Harrell [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #324 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Vote #278 (Y: 161 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #36 (Y: 6 N: 48 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #37 (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Vote #278 (Y: 161 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #36 (Y: 6 N: 48 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #37 (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-02 | Act 134 | |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2019-03-25 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-25 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-22 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-21 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Senate Hopper |