GA SB48 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-14 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Game, Fish, and Parks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 27-2-23 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to hunting, trapping, and fishing license, permit, tag, and stamp fees, so as to freeze the cost of certain hunting licenses that are renewed before expiration; to provide for prospective application; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hunting, Trapping, and Fishing License; hunting licenses that are renewed before expiration; freeze the cost

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate Vote #33 (Y: 53 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-14HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-02-10HouseHouse First Readers
2017-02-09SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2017-02-09SenateSenate Third Read
2017-02-07SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-02-02SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2017-01-25SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-01-24SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback