GA SB479 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 6 of Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to uniform rules of the road, so as to prohibit the use of a stand-alone electronic device or wireless telecommunications device by persons under 18 years of age while operating a motor vehicle; to provide for penalties; to remove a process for being found not guilty of a violation in certain instances; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Rules of the Road; use of a stand-alone electronic device; persons under 18 years of age while operating a motor vehicle; prohibit
Sponsors
Sen. P.K. Martin [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #600 (Y: 49 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate Hopper |