GA SB478 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Act 533
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to create the City of Brookhaven Public Facilities Authority and to provide for the appointment of members of the authority; to confer powers upon the authority; to provide definitions; to authorize the issuance of revenue bonds of the authority; to fix and provide the venue and jurisdiction of actions relating to any provisions of this Act; to exempt the property and revenue bonds of the authority from taxation; to provide for the separate enactment of a certain provision of this Act; to provide a short title; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"City of Brookhaven Public Facilities Authority Act"

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #823 (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - House - House Vote #751 (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate Vote #588 (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08 Act 533
2018-05-08SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-05SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2018-03-29SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2018-03-23HouseHouse Immediately Transmitted to Senate
2018-03-23HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-03-23HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-03-23HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-03-14HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-03-12HouseHouse First Readers
2018-03-09SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2018-03-09SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2018-02-23SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-02-22SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback