GA SB47 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 33 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Georgia Special Needs Scholarship Act, so as to revise the prior school year requirement; to expand eligibility for students; to revise the basis for calculating scholarship amounts; to require annual parent surveys; to provide for a review procedure for scholarship calculations; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Georgia Special Needs Scholarship Act; revise prior school year requirement

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-29 - Senate - Agree To House Substitute: Senate Vote #307 (Y: 30 N: 18 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - Reconsider: House Vote #310 (Y: 61 N: 96 NV: 11 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2021-03-25 - House - Passage: House Vote #309 (Y: 91 N: 71 NV: 6 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Motion For The Previous Question: Senate Vote #113 (Y: 31 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #114 (Y: 30 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Motion To Remove From The Table: Senate Vote #112 (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Motion To Table All Bills On Rules Calendar: Senate Vote #106 (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-01 Effective Date
2021-05-06 Act 243
2021-05-06SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2021-04-07SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2021-03-29SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2021-03-25HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2021-03-25HouseHouse Third Readers
2021-03-22HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-03-08HouseHouse Second Readers
2021-03-05HouseHouse First Readers
2021-03-03SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2021-03-03SenateSenate Third Read
2021-03-03SenateSenate Taken from Table
2021-03-03SenateSenate Tabled
2021-02-24SenateSenate Read Second Time
2021-02-23SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-01-29SenateSenate Read and Referred
2021-01-28SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59080
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/196166
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/198414
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/199524
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/200896
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/201764
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/199371
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59080#18326
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59080#18332
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59080#18334
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59080#18333
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59080#18621
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59080#18622
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59080#18717

Bill Comments

feedback