GA SB47 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 34 of Title 43 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to physicians, physician assistants, and others, so as to provide for licensure exemption for visiting sports teams' physicians; to provide for requirements; to provide for limitations; to provide for agreements with other states; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Physicians; visiting sports teams' physicians; provide for licensure exemption; requirements; limitations; agreements with other states
Sponsors
Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] | Sen. Renee Unterman [R] | Sen. Dean Burke [R] | Sen. Ben Watson [R] |
Sen. Burt Jones [R] | Sen. Gregory Kirk [R] | Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #339 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Vote #271 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #78 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Vote #271 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #78 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2017-05-08 | Act 207 | |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2017-03-15 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-03-15 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-03-09 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-02-24 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-23 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Senate Hopper |