GA SB468 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Agriculture and Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Agriculture and Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 8 of Title 4 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions regarding dogs, so as to require animal shelters to accept registration of veterans' service dogs; to provide definitions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Dogs; animal shelters to accept registration of veterans' service dogs; require
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Vote #575 (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-03-12 | House | House First Readers |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Senate Hopper |