GA SB467 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-26 - House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-26 - House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to create a board of elections and registration for Baldwin County; to provide for its powers and duties; to provide for definitions; to provide for the composition of the board and the selection, qualifications, terms, and removal of members; to provide for vacancies; to provide for oaths and privileges; to provide for the conduct of primaries and elections; to provide for meetings; to provide duties of the chairperson; to allow for joint primaries; to authorize the conduct of municipal elections; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Baldwin County; board of elections and registration; create
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-26 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #537 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #506 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #506 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-26 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-02-26 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-02-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-02-21 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-02-20 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Senate Transmitted House |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Senate Hopper |