GA SB46 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 31 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to health, so as to authorize certain medical personnel to administer vaccines during public health emergencies under certain conditions; to provide for vaccination information to third parties under certain public health conditions; to amend Article 2 of Chapter 34 of Title 43 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to medical practice, so as to revise certain provisions relating to the administration of vaccines under vaccine protocol agreements; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health; certain medical personnel to administer vaccines during public health emergencies under certain conditions; authorize

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-31 - Senate - Agree To House Substitute: Senate Vote #443 (Y: 38 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - Passage: House Vote #418 (Y: 109 N: 56 NV: 10 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #54 (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-10 Effective Date
2021-05-10 Act 292
2021-05-10SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2021-04-07SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2021-03-31SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2021-03-31HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2021-03-31HouseHouse Third Readers
2021-03-31HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2021-03-25HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2021-03-17HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-03-16HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2021-03-10HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-02-23HouseHouse Second Readers
2021-02-22HouseHouse First Readers
2021-02-18SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2021-02-18SenateSenate Third Read
2021-02-11SenateSenate Read Second Time
2021-02-10SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-01-29SenateSenate Read and Referred
2021-01-28SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59079
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/196158
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/197265
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/198060
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/200200
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/200596
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/202289
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/202495
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/198032
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/198059
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59079#18178
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59079#18830
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59079#18945

Bill Comments

feedback