GA SB458 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Act 465
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Act 465
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 5 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions regarding ad valorem taxation of property, so as to provide the conditions upon which family owned farmed entities may elect to discontinue a qualifying use of bona fide conservation use property while incurring reduced penalties; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Ad Valorem Taxation; conditions; family owned farmed entities; discontinue a qualifying use of bona fide conservation use property; provide
Sponsors
Sen. John Wilkinson [R] | Sen. Steve Gooch [R] | Sen. Frank Ginn [R] | Sen. Matt Brass [R] |
Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Rep. David Knight [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #789 (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House Vote #725 (Y: 172 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #498 (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #520 (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House Vote #725 (Y: 172 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #498 (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #520 (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Act 465 | |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2018-03-19 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-03-19 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-03-09 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-03-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-28 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Hopper |