GA SB457 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-21 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-21 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 20-2-1185 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to school safety plans, so as to require every public school and private school to conduct drills on the execution of school safety plans based upon guidance from the Georgia Emergency Management and Homeland Security Agency; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
School Safety Plans; conduct drills on the execution of school safety plans based on guidance from Georgia Emergency Management and Homeland Security Agency; require
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #550 (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2018-03-09 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-03-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-03-01 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Hopper |