GA SB457 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 20-2-2064 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to approval or denial of charter petitions, so as to provide that a local board of education may act on a petition for a conversion charter school for a high school cluster if approved by a majority of the qualified voters in a referendum; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Education; provide local board of education may act on petition for a conversion charter school for a high school cluster; referendum
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Moody [R] | Sen. Dan Weber [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #914 - Agree To House Substitute (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #617 - Passage (Y: 38 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #617 - Passage (Y: 38 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2010-05-27 | Act 492 | |
2010-05-27 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-13 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-29 | Senate Agrees House Amend or Sub | |
2010-04-21 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-21 | House Third Readers | |
2010-04-13 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-30 | House Second Readers | |
2010-03-26 | House First Readers | |
2010-03-24 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-24 | Senate Third Read | |
2010-03-18 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2010-03-17 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-09 | Senate Read and Referred |