GA SB453 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-05 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 36 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to local government, so as to limit the distance between new municipal corporations and existing municipal corporations; to modify the requirements for active municipalities; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local Government; limit the distance between the new municipal corporations and existing municipal corporations; requirements for active municipalities; modify

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #565 (Y: 45 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-05HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-03-01HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-28SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-02-28SenateSenate Third Read
2018-02-26SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-02-23SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-02-21SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-02-20SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback