GA SB450 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Effective Date 2024-04-22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Effective Date 2024-04-22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Titles 5, 15, 44, and 53 of the O.C.G.A., relating to appeal and error, courts, property, and wills, trusts, and administration of estates, respectively, so as to clarify that neither superior court nor a state court shall have appellate jurisdiction pursuant to Chapter 3 of Title 5 over any nonappealable order of a probate court subject to such chapter; to provide for de novo proceeding with the right to a jury trial of certain probate court final judgments; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Courts; property, and wills, trusts, and administration of estates; neither superior court nor a state court shall have appellate jurisdiction pursuant to Chapter 3 of Title 5; clarify
Sponsors
Sen. John Kennedy [R] | Sen. Brian Strickland [R] | Sen. Blake Tillery [R] | Sen. Steve Gooch [R] |
Sen. Harold Jones [D] | Rep. Rob Leverett [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-21 - Senate - Agree To House Substitute: Senate Vote #733 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - House - Passage: House Vote #699 (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #569 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - House - Passage: House Vote #699 (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #569 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Effective Date 2024-04-22 | |
2024-04-22 | Act 424 | |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2024-03-14 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-03-14 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-03-08 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-03-04 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-02-29 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Senate Hopper |