GA SB450 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to reconstitute the Ocilla-Irwin County Industrial Development Authority, approved May 3, 2016 (Ga. L. 2016, p. 4082), so as to change the membership of said Authority; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Ocilla-Irwin County Industrial Development Authority; membership; change
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - House - House Vote #552 (Y: 153 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #499 (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #499 (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Effective Date | |
2020-06-29 | Act 366 | |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2020-03-10 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-03-10 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-03-10 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-03-03 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-03-02 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Hopper |