GA SB45 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 3 of Article 3 of Chapter 11 of Title 16 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to invasions of privacy, so as to prohibit the use of a device to film under or through a person's clothing under certain circumstances; to provide for definitions; to provide for penalties; to provide for exceptions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Invasions of Privacy; to film under or through a person's clothing; prohibit the use of a device

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Vote #55 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-24HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-02-17HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-02-16HouseHouse First Readers
2017-02-15SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-02-15SenateSenate Third Read
2017-02-14SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-02-10SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-01-25SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-01-24SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback